Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/22/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/23/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/23/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/23/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/23/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/23/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/23/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/23/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/23/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 04/23/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 04/23/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 04/23/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 04/23/1991
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/23/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/23/1991
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/23/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/23/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/23/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 04/23/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 04/23/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 04/23/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/23/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/23/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/23/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/23/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/23/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 04/23/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/23/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/23/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/23/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/23/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 04/23/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 04/23/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/23/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/23/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/23/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/23/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/23/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/14/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 05/14/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 05/14/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/14/1991
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 05/14/1991
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/14/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/14/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/14/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/14/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/14/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/14/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/14/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/14/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/14/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/14/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 05/14/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/14/1991
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/14/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/14/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/14/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/14/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 05/14/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/14/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/14/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/14/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/14/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 05/14/1991
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/14/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/14/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/14/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/14/1991
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 06/05/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 06/05/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 06/05/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 06/05/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 06/05/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/05/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/05/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/05/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/05/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 06/05/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/05/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/05/1991
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/05/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/05/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/05/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 06/05/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/05/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/05/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 06/05/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/05/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 06/05/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/05/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/05/1991
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/05/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/05/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/05/1991
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/05/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/05/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/05/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/05/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 06/05/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/05/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 06/05/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 06/05/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/05/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/05/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/05/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/12/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/12/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/12/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/12/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/12/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/12/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/12/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/12/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/12/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/12/1991
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/12/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/12/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/12/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/12/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 06/12/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/12/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/12/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/12/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/12/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/12/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/12/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/12/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/12/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 06/12/1991
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 06/12/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/12/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/12/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/12/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/12/1991
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/12/1991
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 06/12/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 06/12/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/12/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/12/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 06/12/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/12/1991
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/12/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/12/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/12/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/12/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/12/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 06/12/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/12/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/12/1991
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 06/12/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 06/12/1991