Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 06/04/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 06/04/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 06/04/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/13/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/13/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/13/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/13/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 06/13/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/13/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/13/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/13/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/25/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/25/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/25/1991
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/25/1991
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/25/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/25/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/25/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/25/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/25/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/25/1991
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/25/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/25/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/25/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/25/1991
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/09/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/09/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 07/09/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/09/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/09/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/09/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/09/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/22/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/22/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/22/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 07/22/1991