Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 06/12/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/12/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/12/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/12/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/12/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 06/12/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 06/12/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4]* 06/12/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/27/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/27/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/27/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/27/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/27/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/27/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/27/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/27/1991
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/27/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/27/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 06/27/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 06/27/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 06/27/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/27/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/27/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 08/02/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 09/25/1991
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/25/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 09/25/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 09/25/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/16/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/16/1991
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 10/16/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/20/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/07/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/07/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/07/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 04/07/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/07/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 04/09/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/28/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/29/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 04/29/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/29/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/29/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/29/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/29/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/29/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/29/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 04/29/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/30/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/30/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/05/1992
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 05/07/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/12/1992
Rep. Rostenkowski, Dan [D-IL-8] 05/12/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/20/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 05/28/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/02/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/02/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/04/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/04/1992
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 06/04/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/04/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/04/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/04/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 06/05/1992
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 06/05/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/05/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/05/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/05/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 06/05/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/09/1992
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/09/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/09/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/09/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/09/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/09/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/09/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/09/1992
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 06/10/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/10/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/10/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/10/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/10/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/10/1992
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/10/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/10/1992
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/10/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/10/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/10/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/10/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/10/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/10/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/10/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/10/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 06/10/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 06/10/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/10/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/10/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/10/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/11/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/11/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/11/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/11/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/11/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/11/1992
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/18/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/18/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/18/1992
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/18/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/18/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/18/1992
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/18/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/18/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/18/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/18/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/18/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/18/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/18/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/18/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/18/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/29/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/29/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/09/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/09/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 07/09/1992