Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 03/26/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 03/26/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/09/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/09/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/09/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/09/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/09/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/09/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 04/09/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 04/09/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/09/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/09/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 04/09/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 04/09/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/09/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/09/1992
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/09/1992
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/09/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/09/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 04/09/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/04/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 05/04/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/04/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/04/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 05/04/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/04/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/04/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/04/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 05/04/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/04/1992
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/04/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 05/04/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/04/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/04/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/04/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/04/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 06/09/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/09/1992
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 06/09/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/09/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/09/1992
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/09/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/09/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 06/09/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/09/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 06/09/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/09/1992
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 06/09/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/09/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/09/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/09/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/09/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 06/09/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/09/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 06/09/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 08/06/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/06/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/06/1992