Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 05/28/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/11/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/11/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/11/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/11/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/11/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/11/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/11/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/11/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/11/1992
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/11/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/11/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 06/11/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/02/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/02/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/02/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/02/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 07/02/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/02/1992
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 07/02/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/02/1992
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 07/21/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/21/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 07/21/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 07/21/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 07/21/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 08/11/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 08/11/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 08/11/1992
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/11/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/11/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 08/11/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 08/11/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/16/1992
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/16/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/16/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/05/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/05/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 10/05/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 10/05/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/05/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/05/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/05/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/05/1992