Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/16/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 06/16/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/24/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/24/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/24/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/24/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/24/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/24/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/24/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 06/24/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/24/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/02/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/02/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/02/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/02/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/02/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/02/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/02/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/22/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/22/1992
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/22/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/30/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 08/05/1992