Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 08/12/1992
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 08/12/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 08/12/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 08/12/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 08/12/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/12/1992
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 08/12/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 08/12/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/15/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/15/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 09/15/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/15/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/15/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 09/15/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 09/15/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 09/15/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/15/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 09/15/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/15/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/15/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/15/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 09/15/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/15/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/15/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/15/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 09/15/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 09/15/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/15/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/15/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/15/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/15/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/15/1992
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 09/15/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 09/15/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 09/15/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/15/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/15/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 09/15/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 09/15/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 09/15/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/15/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 09/15/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/15/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 09/15/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/15/1992
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 09/15/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/17/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/17/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 09/17/1992
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 09/17/1992
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 09/17/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 09/17/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/17/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 09/17/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/17/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/17/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/17/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/17/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/22/1992
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/22/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/22/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/22/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/22/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/22/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 09/22/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 09/23/1992
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 09/23/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 09/23/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 09/23/1992
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/23/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 09/23/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/23/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/23/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 09/23/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/23/1992
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 09/23/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 09/23/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/23/1992
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/23/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/23/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/23/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/23/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 09/23/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/23/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/23/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/23/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 09/23/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/23/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 09/23/1992
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 09/23/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 09/23/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 09/23/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/23/1992
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 09/23/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/23/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 09/23/1992
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/23/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/23/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/23/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/23/1992
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/23/1992
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 09/23/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/23/1992
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 09/23/1992
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/01/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 10/01/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/01/1992
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/01/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/01/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 10/01/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 10/01/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/01/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/01/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/02/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 10/02/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 10/02/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/02/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/02/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 10/02/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 10/02/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/02/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/02/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/02/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/05/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/05/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 10/05/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/05/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 10/05/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/05/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 10/05/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/05/1992
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 10/05/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/05/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 10/05/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/05/1992
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 10/05/1992
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 10/05/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/05/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/05/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/05/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/05/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 10/05/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 10/05/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/05/1992