Text: H.J.Res.535 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House

 
 
HJ 535 IH
102d CONGRESS
2d Session
H. J. RES. 535
Designating September 9, 1992, as `Haitian Freedom Day'.
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
August 4, 1992
Mr. RANGEL introduced the following joint resolution; which was referred to
the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
JOINT RESOLUTION
Designating September 9, 1992, as `Haitian Freedom Day'.
Whereas the people of Haiti have repeatedly manifested their aspirations for
democracy, a constitutional government, and equitable economic development,
as outlined in the Constitution of the Republic of Haiti, which was ratified
on March 19, 1987;
Whereas the 1987 Presidential election in Haiti was canceled due to widespread
violence on the day of the election;
Whereas the people of Haiti participated in a 2d, internationally supervised,
Presidential election on December 16, 1990;
Whereas, in such election, which was recognized by international observers
as free, fair, and open, President Jean-Bertrand Aristide was elected by
almost 70 percent of the vote;
Whereas, on September 30, 1991, elements of the Haitian military launched
an armed attack against President Aristide and the people of Haiti;
Whereas President Aristide was forced to leave Haiti, and a military junta
has seized power;
Whereas, since the departure of President Aristide, military forces loyal
to the junta have reportedly engaged in widespread murder and intimidation
of the people of Haiti;
Whereas the Federal Government has joined the Organization of American States
in condemning the coup and imposing an economic embargo against the de facto
Government of Haiti;
Whereas Members of Congress have introduced legislation to penalize supporters
of the coup of September 30;
Whereas Members of Congress have introduced legislation to ensure that Haitian
refugees are treated in accordance with international law and the law of the
United States and are considered for safe haven in the United States until
democracy is restored in Haiti;
Whereas Haitian-Americans, African-Americans, and people in the United States
of all races and national backgrounds have joined together to support the
restoration of democracy in Haiti and the fair and compassionate treatment
of Haitian refugees;
Whereas people in the United States of all religions, whether Protestant,
Catholic, Jewish, Muslim, or Hindu, have joined in the movement to support
the restoration of democracy in Haiti and the fair and compassionate treatment
of Haitian refugees; and
Whereas, in an initiative spearheaded by TransAfrica, Incorporated, and the
National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, supporters of
democracy in Haiti and fair treatment of Haitian refugees will rally at the
White House on September 9, 1992, to appeal to the President to support the
cause vigorously: Now, therefore, be it
  Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States
  of America in Congress assembled, That September 9, 1992, is designated as
  `Haitian Freedom Day', and the President is authorized and requested to
  issue a proclamation calling on the people of the United States to observe
  the day with appropriate ceremonies and activities.

Share This