Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 09/22/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/22/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/22/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 09/22/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 09/22/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 09/22/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/25/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/25/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/25/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/25/1992
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/25/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/25/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 09/25/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/25/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 09/29/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/29/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 09/29/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 09/29/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/29/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/29/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/29/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/29/1992
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/29/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/29/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 09/29/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/30/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/30/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/30/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/30/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/01/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/01/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 10/01/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/01/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/01/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/01/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/01/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/01/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/01/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/02/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/02/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/03/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/03/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 10/03/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/04/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 10/05/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/05/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 10/05/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/05/1992