Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 03/06/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/06/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 03/22/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 03/22/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/22/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/22/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/22/1991
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 03/22/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/22/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/09/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 04/09/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 04/09/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/10/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/10/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/10/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 04/16/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/16/1991
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 04/16/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/16/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/16/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/16/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 04/17/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/17/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 04/17/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 04/17/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/17/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/17/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 04/17/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/24/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/24/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/24/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/24/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/24/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/24/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/24/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/24/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/24/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/24/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/24/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/25/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 04/25/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/25/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/25/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 04/25/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 04/25/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 04/25/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/30/1991
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/30/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 04/30/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/30/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/30/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/02/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/02/1991
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 05/02/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/02/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/02/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/02/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/02/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/02/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/02/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/02/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/06/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/06/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/06/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 05/06/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/06/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/06/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 05/08/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 05/08/1991
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/08/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/09/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/09/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/09/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/09/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/15/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/15/1991