Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/12/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 03/12/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/12/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/12/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/12/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 03/12/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/12/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/12/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/12/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/12/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/12/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/12/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/12/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/12/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/12/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/12/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/12/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 03/12/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 03/12/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 03/12/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 03/12/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/12/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/12/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/12/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/12/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/12/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/12/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/12/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/12/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/12/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/12/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 03/12/1991
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/10/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/10/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/10/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/10/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 04/10/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 04/10/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/10/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/10/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/10/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/08/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/08/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 05/08/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 05/08/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/08/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 05/08/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/08/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/01/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 11/01/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/01/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/01/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 11/01/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/01/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 11/01/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/27/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/27/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 11/27/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/27/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/19/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 03/26/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 03/26/1992
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/26/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 03/26/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 04/29/1992