Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 11/22/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 11/22/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 11/22/1991
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 11/22/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/22/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 11/26/1991
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/26/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 11/26/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/26/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 11/26/1991
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/26/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 11/26/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 11/26/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 11/26/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/26/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 11/26/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/26/1991
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 01/03/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 01/03/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 01/03/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 01/03/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 01/03/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/03/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/1992