Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 01/28/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 02/05/1992
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 02/05/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/05/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/05/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/05/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 02/05/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 02/05/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/05/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/05/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 02/05/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/05/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/05/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/19/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/19/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/19/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 02/19/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 02/19/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 02/19/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/25/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/25/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 02/26/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 02/26/1992
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 02/26/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/26/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/27/1992
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/27/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 02/27/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 02/27/1992
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 02/27/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/27/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/27/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 02/27/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/03/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/03/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/09/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/17/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/17/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 03/24/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/07/1992