Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 02/05/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 02/05/1992
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 02/05/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/05/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 02/19/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/19/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 02/19/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/19/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/19/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 02/19/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/19/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/19/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/19/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/19/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 02/19/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/19/1992
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 02/19/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/19/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/19/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/27/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/27/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/27/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/27/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/27/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/27/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/16/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/16/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/16/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/16/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/16/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 03/16/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/20/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/20/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/12/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/12/1992