Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 03/12/1992
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 03/12/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/12/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 03/12/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 03/12/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 03/12/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/12/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 03/12/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/12/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 03/12/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/12/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/12/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/20/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/20/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/20/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/20/1992
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/02/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 04/02/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/02/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/07/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 05/07/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/07/1992
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 05/07/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/07/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/07/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/22/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/09/1992