Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 08/04/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 08/04/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 08/05/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 08/05/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 08/05/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 08/05/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 08/05/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/05/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/06/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/06/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/12/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 08/12/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 08/12/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 09/15/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 09/15/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/15/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/15/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 09/15/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/15/1992
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/15/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 09/15/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/15/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 09/15/1992
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/15/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/15/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/15/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/15/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/18/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/18/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/23/1992
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/23/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/23/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 09/30/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 09/30/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 10/02/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/02/1992