Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 01/22/1991
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 01/22/1991
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 01/22/1991
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/05/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/05/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 04/23/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/23/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/23/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/23/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/23/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/07/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/14/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/14/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/14/1991