There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Scientific and Advanced-Technology Act of 1992

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Scientific and Advanced-Technology Act of 1992

Short Titles as Introduced

National Advanced Technician Training Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a national advanced technician training program, utilizing the resources of the Nation's two-year associate-degree-granting colleges to expand the pool of skilled technicians in strategic advanced-technology fields, to increase the productivity of the Nation's industries, and to improve the competitiveness of the United States in international trade, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/23/1992Became Public Law No: 102-476.
10/23/1992Signed by President.
10/23/1992Became Law No. 102-476
10/15/1992Presented to President.
10/03/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
10/02/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/02/1992Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/23/1992Became Public Law No: 102-476.
10/23/1992Signed by President.
10/23/1992Became Law No. 102-476
10/15/1992SenatePresented to President.
10/05/1992SenateMessage on House action received in Senate.
10/03/1992-7:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/03/1992-7:03pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
10/03/1992-7:03pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
10/03/1992-7:03pmHouseMr. Boucher asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
10/03/1992-11:57amHouseReceived in the House.
10/02/1992SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/02/1992SenateS.Amdt.3390 Amendment SP 3390 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/02/1992SenateS.Amdt.3390 Proposed by Senator Exon for Senator Mikulski. To establish programs at the National Science Foundation to strengthen and improve the scientific and technical education capabilities of associate-degree-granting institutions, and for other purposes.
10/02/1992SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/02/1992SenateSenate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/1991SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/16/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/10/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 09/17/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Labor and Human Resources05/23/1991 Referred to
10/02/1992 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.1146.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1146. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/02/1992)

Scientific and Advanced-Technology Act of 1992 - Requires the Director of the National Science Foundation (NSF) (the Director) to carry out a national advanced technician training program of awarding competitive grants to accredited associate-degree-granting colleges which can provide competency-based technical training in advanced-technology occupational fields. Includes among authorized activities: (1) model instructional programs development; (2) faculty and instructor professional development; (3) partnerships between the private sector and associate-degree-granting colleges; (4) acquisition of state-of-the-art instrumentation; and (5) instructional materials development and dissemination.

Requires the Director to award competitive grants to establish up to ten centers of excellence among associate-degree-granting colleges. Requires such centers to have: (1) exceptional instructional programs in advanced technology fields; and/or (2) excellence in undergraduate education in mathematics and science.

Requires such centers to serve as national and regional technical education clearinghouses and models for other colleges and secondary schools. Requires such centers to provide seminars and programs to disseminate model curricula, teaching methods, and instructional materials to other associate-degree-granting colleges in their region.

Requires the Director to make partnership grants (to eligible partnerships of one or more associate-degree-granting colleges with one or more separate bachelor-degree-granting colleges) to encourage students to pursue, and to assist students who are pursuing, bachelor degrees in mathematics, science, engineering, or technolgoy, in making the transition from associate-degree to bachelor-degree granting institutions. Sets forth authorized activities such as: (1) examining curricula to assure transferability of credits; (2) informing associate-degree faculty of the bachelor-degree requirements; and (3) providing summer educational programs to encourage matriculation. Requires partnerships receiving such grants to use non-Federal funds to: (1) counsel students, including those who have been in the workforce, about bachelor-degree requirements; and (2) conduct workshops and orientations on bachelor-degree institution programs, including laboratories and financial aid. Makes institutions participating in such partnerships, during the duration of such grant, ineligible for the Articulation Agreements grants program for partnerships between two-year and four-year institutions of higher education under the Higher Education Act of 1965 (HEA).

Requires the Director to make outreach grants to associate-degree-granting colleges with outstanding mathematics and science programs to strengthen relationships with secondary schools in their community by improving mathematics and science education and encouraging secondary school students' interest and aptitude for careers in science and advanced-technology fields. Includes among authorized activities developing agreements with local educational agencies to satisfy entrance and course requirements at the associate-degree-granting college.

Requires program coordination with programs and policies of relevant Federal agencies. Requires coordination of activities under the partnership grants program with those under the HEA Articulation Agreements program.

Requires the Director to: (1) award grants under this Act on a competitive, merit basis, ensuring equitable geographic distribution and specified non-Federal matching contributions; (2) establish and maintain a readily accessible inventory of advanced technician training programs; and (3) designate an NSF officer to serve as liaison with associatee-degree-granting institutions to enhance their role in NSF activities.

Amends the National Science Foundation Act of 1950 to authorize the NSF to foster and support access by the research and education communities to computer networks which may be used substantially for additional purposes if this will tend to increase the networks' overall capabilities to support research and education in the science and engineering.

Authorizes appropriations for FY 1992 and 1993 to carry out this Act.