There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Popular Titles

Chinese Student Protection Act bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Chinese Student Protection Act of 1992

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Chinese Student Protection Act of 1992

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Chinese Student Protection Act of 1992

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Chinese Student Protection Act of 1992

Short Titles as Introduced

Chinese Student Protection Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to provide for the adjustment of status under the Immigration and Nationality Act of certain nationals of the People's Republic of China unless conditions permit their return in safety to that foreign state.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the deferral of enforced departure and the granting of lawful temporary resident status in the United States to certain classes of nonimmigrant aliens of the People's Republic of China.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
10/09/1992Became Public Law No: 102-404.
10/09/1992Signed by President.
10/09/1992Became Public Law No. 102-404
09/30/1992Presented to President.
09/23/1992Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment. By Voice Vote.
08/10/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/10/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 102-826.
05/21/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
05/07/1992Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
06/04/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/09/1992Became Public Law No: 102-404.
10/09/1992Signed by President.
10/09/1992Became Public Law No. 102-404
09/30/1992SenatePresented to President.
09/30/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/23/1992SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment. By Voice Vote.
08/11/1992SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
08/10/1992-3:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/10/1992-3:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/10/1992-2:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
08/10/1992-2:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
08/10/1992-2:57pmHouseMr. Brooks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/10/1992HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 471.
08/10/1992HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 102-826.
07/22/1992HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/22/1992HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/24/1992HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees
06/24/1992HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees
06/01/1992HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/27/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
05/26/1992-2:02pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/26/1992-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/21/1992SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
05/07/1992SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/07/1992SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 457.
05/07/1992SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
04/03/1992SenateSubcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs
06/04/1991SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary06/04/1991 Referred to
05/07/1992 Markup by
05/07/1992 Reported by
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs04/03/1992 Markup by
04/03/1992 Reported by
House Judiciary05/27/1992 Referred to
07/22/1992 Markup by
08/10/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-826
House Judiciary Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees06/01/1992 Referred to
06/24/1992 Markup by
06/24/1992 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.1216.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1216. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/10/1992)

Chinese Student Protection Act of 1992 - Sets forth the following rules for certain Chinese nationals who apply for adjustment to lawful permanent resident (immigrant) status under the Immigration and Nationality Act during the one-year period beginning July 1, 1993: (1) such aliens shall be deemed to have had an approved petition for employment-based admission; (2) such aliens shall be exempt from provisions regarding visa number availability, numerical levels, labor certification, entry document requirements, and the two-year home country residence requirement; and (3) the Attorney General may waive other grounds for excludability (except for certain criminal and security grounds) for humanitarian or family reasons, or if otherwise in the public interest.

Applies such provisions to nationals of the People's Republic of China (PRC) described in a specified Executive Order who have resided continuously in the United States since April 11, 1990, and who were not present in the PRC for more than 90 days after such date and before the date of enactment of this Act.

Makes such status adjustment provisions inapplicable if the President determines and certifies to the Congress before the application period that conditions in the PRC permit the aliens' safe return. Directs the Attorney General to disseminate status adjustment information to the aliens if the President does not make this determination.

Reduces annual PRC immigrant visas to offset status adjustments under this Act (1,000 annually to be allocated between skilled workers (300) and investors (700) if annual entry ceilings are in effect with respect to the PRC.).