Committees: S.1216 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary06/04/1991 Referred to
05/07/1992 Markup by
05/07/1992 Reported by
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs04/03/1992 Markup by
04/03/1992 Reported by
House Judiciary05/27/1992 Referred to
07/22/1992 Markup by
08/10/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-826
House Judiciary Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees06/01/1992 Referred to
06/24/1992 Markup by
06/24/1992 Reported by