Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 06/13/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 06/13/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/01/1991
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 10/01/1991
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/23/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 10/23/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/26/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 11/26/1991
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/26/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 01/22/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/06/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/22/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 10/05/1992