Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 06/19/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/15/1991
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 07/22/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/10/1991
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 09/18/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/08/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/07/1992