Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 01/29/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 01/29/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 01/29/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/29/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/29/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/29/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 01/29/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 01/29/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/29/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 01/29/1991
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/05/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/05/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/05/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 02/20/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/20/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/05/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/05/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 03/12/1991
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/14/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/19/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/09/1991
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 04/11/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/11/1991
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/11/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/11/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/11/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/11/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/11/1991
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 04/11/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/11/1991
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/23/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 05/07/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 05/07/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/22/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 05/23/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/03/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/25/1991
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/28/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 07/09/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/11/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/11/1991
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 07/16/1991
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/23/1991
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 07/23/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 07/26/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/26/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/26/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/30/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/30/1991
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 08/01/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 08/01/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/11/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/25/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/15/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 11/05/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/19/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 01/22/1992
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/12/1992