Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/19/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/19/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/05/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/05/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/05/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/20/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/20/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/20/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/08/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/22/1991