There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a program of marriage and family counseling for certain veterans of the Persian Gulf War and the spouses and families of such veterans.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/15/1991Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/24/1991Committee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Cranston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-159. Minority views filed.
07/24/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
11/25/1991HouseSimiliar Provisions Included in H.R.2280.
11/20/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
11/20/1991HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
11/18/1991HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Armed Services.
11/18/1991HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/18/1991SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/18/1991-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/15/1991SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/24/1991SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 238.
09/24/1991SenateCommittee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Cranston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-159. Minority views filed.
09/12/1991SenateCommittee on Veterans. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/24/1991SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/24/1991 Referred to
09/12/1991 Markup by
09/24/1991 Reported by S.Rept 102-159
House Veterans' Affairs11/18/1991 Referred to
House Armed Services11/18/1991 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation11/20/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1553.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1553. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/15/1991)

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to conduct a program for furnishing marriage and family counseling services to veterans who were awarded a campaign medal for active-duty service during the Persian Gulf War, reservists who were called or ordered to active duty during such War, and their spouses, dependents, and parents. Authorizes the Secretary to provide marriage and family counseling services that the Secretary determines, based on an assessment by a mental-health professional, are necessary for the amelioration of psychological, marital, or familial difficulties resulting from such active-duty service. Outlines provisions concerning the manner in which such services will be furnished, as well as qualifications required of the marriage and family counselors performing such services. Outlines provisions concerning counseling services provided by mental health professionals pursuant to Department of Veterans Affairs contracts, including the length of marriage and counseling services to be performed under the program. Prohibits the same person who performs the counseling needs assessment from furnishing the marriage and counseling services under the program, with a waiver of such prohibition under specified circumstances. Directs the Secretary to reimburse the mental health professionals for the reasonable costs of such counseling services. Provides cost recovery provisions. Authorizes appropriations for FY 1991 through 1994. Terminates the program at the end of FY 1994. Requires the Secretary to report to the Congress on such program, with recommendations.