There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Technology Transfer Improvements Act of 1991

Short Titles as Introduced

Technology Transfer Improvements Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Stevenson-Wydler Technology Innovation Act of 1980 to enhance technology transfer for works prepared under certain cooperative research and development.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/31/1992Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged. Pursuant to the order of June 24, 1992.
11/27/1991Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment. With written report No. 102-254.
07/29/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date
07/28/1993Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 102-1113.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks
07/31/1992Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 587.
Action By: Senate
07/31/1992Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged. Pursuant to the order of June 24, 1992.
Action By: Senate
07/28/1992Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 102-1133.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks
07/28/1992Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks
07/17/1992Referred to Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/24/1992Referred to the Committee on Judiciary by unanimous consent for a period not to extend beyond July 31, 1992.
Action By: Senate
11/27/1991Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 387.
Action By: Senate
11/27/1991Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment. With written report No. 102-254.
10/03/1991Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
09/13/1991Committee on Commerce. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 102-489.
07/29/1991Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 09/17/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/29/1991 Referred to
09/13/1991 Hearings by
10/03/1991 Markup by
11/27/1991 Reported by S.Rept 102-254
Senate Judiciary06/24/1992 Referred to
07/31/1992 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks07/17/1992 Referred to
07/28/1993 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1581. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (11/27/1991)

Technology Transfer Improvements Act of 1991 - Amends the Stevenson-Wydler Technology Innovation Act of 1980 to allow each Federal agency to: (1) secure copyright on behalf of the United States in any computer software prepared in whole or in part by U.S. employees under a cooperative research and development agreement or other authority, notwithstanding provisions of Federal copyright law; (2) grant in advance to a collaborating party licenses or assignments for the copyrights, or options thereto; and (3) when such an assignment is made, retain specified rights.

Adds references to software and its author to provisions governing the distribution of royalties received by Federal agencies.