Committees: S.1581 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/29/1991 Referred to
09/13/1991 Hearings by
10/03/1991 Markup by
11/27/1991 Reported by S.Rept 102-254
Senate Judiciary06/24/1992 Referred to
07/31/1992 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks07/17/1992 Referred to
07/28/1993 Hearings by