Committees: S.1607 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs07/31/1991 Referred to
11/15/1991 Hearings by
06/16/1992 Markup by
07/29/1992 Reported by S.Rept 102-347
House Interior and Insular Affairs08/10/1992 Referred to
09/16/1992 Markup by
09/22/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-894