Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 11/05/1991
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 11/07/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 11/07/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 11/12/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/12/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/13/1991
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 11/13/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/15/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 11/27/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/22/1992
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 01/27/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/07/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/29/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/13/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/13/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/30/1992