Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/17/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/17/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/22/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/23/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 10/23/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/23/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/30/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/01/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/06/1991