Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/14/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 11/14/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 11/14/1991
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/14/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 11/14/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/14/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/14/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/14/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 11/14/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 11/14/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/14/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/21/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 11/21/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/21/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 11/21/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 11/21/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 11/21/1991
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 11/21/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 11/21/1991
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 11/21/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/21/1991
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 11/21/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/21/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/21/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/22/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 11/22/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/22/1991
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/22/1991
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 11/22/1991
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/22/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/22/1991
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 11/22/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 11/22/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/22/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/22/1991
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 11/22/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/22/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/22/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/22/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 11/22/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/22/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/22/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/22/1991
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 11/26/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 11/26/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/27/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/28/1992
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/28/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 01/28/1992