Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/08/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 11/06/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 11/06/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 11/06/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 11/06/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/06/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 11/06/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/06/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/06/1991
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 11/06/1991
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 11/06/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 11/06/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 11/06/1991
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 11/06/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/06/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 11/06/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 11/06/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/06/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 11/06/1991
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/06/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/06/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 11/06/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 11/06/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/06/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/06/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/06/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/06/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/06/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 11/06/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/06/1991
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 11/06/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/06/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/06/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/06/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 11/06/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/06/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 11/06/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/06/1991
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 11/06/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 11/06/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 11/06/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/06/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 11/06/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/06/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/14/1991
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 11/19/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/20/1991
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 11/20/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/28/1992