Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 01/14/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/14/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/22/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 01/22/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/06/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/28/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 11/12/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 01/30/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/26/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew