Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/14/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 01/16/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/17/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 08/01/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 10/25/1991

Show cosponsors who withdrew