Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/12/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/12/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/12/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/12/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/12/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/09/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/09/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/09/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 04/24/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/16/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 05/16/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/23/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/20/1991
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/01/1991
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/24/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 10/30/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 01/21/1992