Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/14/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 01/17/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 01/17/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 01/17/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 01/22/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/22/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/22/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/22/1991
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 01/22/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 01/22/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/24/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 01/30/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 01/30/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 01/30/1991
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 01/31/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/31/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/05/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/05/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/07/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/05/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/13/1991