Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 11/26/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 11/26/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 11/26/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/10/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/11/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/06/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/07/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/21/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 08/05/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 09/08/1992