Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/01/1992)

Government Performance and Results Act of 1992 - Requires the head of each agency, not later than September 30, 1997, to submit to the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) a strategic plan for performance goals of program activities. Requires such plan to cover at least a five-year period and to be updated at least every three years.

Requires the inclusion of performance plans in the President's budget beginning with FY 1999.

Directs the OMB to require each agency to prepare annul performance plans covering each program activity set forth in the budget of the agency.

Requires the head of each agency, not later than March 31, 2000, and annually thereafter, to submit to the President and the Congress a report on program performance for the previous fiscal year. Requires such reports to set forth performance indicators established in the performance plan, along with actual program performance achieved compared with the performance goals expressed in the plan for that fiscal year. Requires the report for FY 2000 to include actual results for the preceding fiscal years, the report for FY 2001 to include actual results for the two preceding fiscal years, and the report for FY 2002 and all subsequent reports to include actual results for the three preceding fiscal years. Specifies the contents of such reports.

Authorizes the Director of OMB to exempt any agency with annual outlays of $20,000,000 or less from strategic and performance plan reporting requirements.

Allows performance plans to include proposals to waive administrative procedural requirements and controls in return for specific individual or organization accountability to achieve a performance goal. Requires such proposals to describe the anticipated effects on performance resulting from greater managerial or organizational flexibility, discretion, and authority, and to quantify the expected improvements in performance resulting from any waiver. Requires such proposals waiving limitations on compensation or remuneration to precisely express the monetary change in compensation or remuneration amounts that result from meeting, exceeding, or failing to meet performance goals. Requires waivers to be in effect for one to three years. Allows any waiver in effect for three consecutive years to be made permanent, other than a waiver of limitations on compensation or remuneration.

Requires the Director of OMB to designate not less than ten agencies (representing a range of Government functions) as pilot projects in performance measurement for FY 1994, 1995, 1996.

Requires the Director of OMB to designate not less than five agencies (selected from agencies in the other pilot projects) as pilot projects in managerial accountability and flexibility for FY 1995 and 1996. Requires such projects to include proposed waivers for one or more of the major functions and operations of the agency. Requires the Director to report to the President and the Congress by May 1, 1997, on the results of such pilot projects, including their usefulness in meeting the purposes of this Act.

Requires the Director to designate not less than five agencies (selected from agencies in the other pilot projects) as pilot projects in performance budgeting for FY 1998 and 1999. Requires such projects to cover the preparation of performance budgets, including outcome-related performance that would result from different budgeted amounts. Requires the Director, as an alternative budget presentation in the budget for FY 1999, to include the performance budgets of the designated agencies for that fiscal year. Requires a report to the President, by March 31, 2001, on such pilot projects.

Prohibits this Act from being construed as limiting the ability of Congress to establish, amend, suspend, or annul a performance goal.

Requires the Comptroller General to report to the Congress by June 1, 1997, on the implementation of this Act.

Directs the Office of Personnel Management, in consultation with the Director of OMB and the Comptroller General, to develop a performance measurement training component for its management training program and otherwise provide managers with an orientation on the development and use of strategic planning and program performance measurement.

Sets forth the congressional procedure for implementing strategic planning initiatives under this Act.