Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 11/27/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/07/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/09/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/09/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/09/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/09/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 06/09/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/09/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/09/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/09/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/09/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/24/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/24/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/24/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/24/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/24/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/24/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/24/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/24/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/24/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/20/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/20/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/20/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/20/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/20/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/20/1992
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/20/1992
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/20/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/20/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/20/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/20/1992
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/20/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/20/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/20/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/20/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/20/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/20/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/20/1992
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 07/20/1992
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/20/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/20/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/20/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/20/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 08/03/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 08/03/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 08/03/1992
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 08/03/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/11/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/08/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew