Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/30/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/30/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/30/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 01/30/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/04/1992
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/18/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/04/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/05/1992