Summary: S.2173 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.2173. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/31/1992)

Amends the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Act of 1991 (Public Law 102-164) to add 13 weeks to the number of weeks of benefits payable under the emergency unemployment compensation program.

Provides for a total number of weeks of such emergency benefits as follows: (1) 33 weeks (currently 20) in higher unemployment States (with a total unemployment rate of nine percent or higher or an adjusted insured unemployment rate of five percent or higher, for specified periods); and (2) 26 weeks (currently 13) for all other States.

Extends to July 4, 1992, the expiration date of the emergency unemployment program (currently June 13, 1992). Provides that those who qualify for emergency benefits before the July 4, 1992, expiration date shall receive the full number of weeks to which they are entitled (but makes the increased-by-13-maximum number of weeks applicable only to those eligible by June 13, 1992, and the current maximums applicable to those who first become eligible after June 13).

Amends Internal Revenue Code (IRC) provisions to provide for a temporary increase in the amount of certain corporate estimated tax payments, by setting the applicable percentage for such annualized payments at 95 percent of the tax liability for each of 1993 through 1996 (current law sets it at 94 percent for 1993 and 1994, and 95 percent in 1995 and 1996).

Extends to June 30, 1992 (currently January 31, 1992) the deadline by which employers must pay certain additional taxes under Federal Unemployment Tax Act (FUTA) provisions of the IRC, if they are in a credit reduction State with an unemployment trust fund balance below a certain amount. Allows such employer taxpayers to elect to defer payment until such later date, but requires payment of interest after January 31, 1992 (but not penalties until after June 30, 1992).

Extends to July 4, 1992, the program of temporary unemployment benefits for certain railroad workers (under the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Act of 1991). Increases the number of weeks of such benefits for those that are eligible by June 13, 1992.