Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/05/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/05/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/06/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/07/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/18/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 02/18/1992
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/18/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/18/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/03/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/03/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/03/1992
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/03/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/19/1992