There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Social Security Act to extend the terms of service of the members of the National Commission on Children, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/22/1992Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Kennedy without amendment. Without written report.
02/25/1992Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
07/22/1992Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 550.
Action By: Senate
07/22/1992Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Kennedy without amendment. Without written report.
07/01/1992Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/25/1992Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/25/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Labor and Human Resources02/25/1992 Referred to
07/01/1992 Markup by
07/22/1992 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.2257.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2257. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/25/1992)

Amends title XI of the Social Security Act to extend to December 31, 1992, the terms of service of members of the National Commission on Children. Terminates the Commission on such date. Provides that the Executive Director and staff of the Commission shall have until March 31, 1993, to close down operations of the Commission.