Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 02/26/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 02/26/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/27/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/11/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/18/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/13/1992