There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Popular Titles

Veterans Compensation Rate Amendments bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1992

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Rate Amendments of 1992

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/24/1992Became Public Law No: 102-510.
10/24/1992Signed by President.
10/15/1992Presented to President.
09/30/1992Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendments Agreed to without objection.
09/22/1992Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in the House amendments with an amendment (SP 3154) by Voice Vote.
08/04/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.
07/28/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/20/1992Committee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Cranston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-322.
03/05/1992Introduced in Senate

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/24/1992Became Public Law No: 102-510.
10/24/1992Signed by President.
10/15/1992SenatePresented to President.
10/01/1992SenateMessage on House action received in Senate.
09/30/1992-6:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/1992-6:37pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendments Agreed to without objection.
09/30/1992-6:36pmHouseMr. Montgomery asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendments.
09/25/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/22/1992SenateSenate concurred in the House amendments with an amendment (SP 3154) by Voice Vote.
09/22/1992SenateS.Amdt.3154 Amendment SP 3154 voice agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
09/22/1992SenateS.Amdt.3154 Proposed by Senator Pryor for Senator Cranston. To increase the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans.
09/22/1992SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
08/06/1992SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
08/04/1992-5:42pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 4244 was laid on the table without objection.
08/04/1992-5:42pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
08/04/1992-5:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/04/1992-5:42pmHouseOn passage Passed by voice vote.
08/04/1992-5:42pmHouseThe House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 4244. Agreed to without objection.
08/04/1992-5:41pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
08/04/1992-5:41pmHouseMr. Montgomery asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
07/29/1992-1:50pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/29/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/29/1992-10:01amHouseReceived in the House.
07/28/1992SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/20/1992SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 546.
07/20/1992SenateCommittee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Cranston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-322.
06/24/1992SenateCommittee on Veterans. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/20/1992SenateCommittee on Veterans. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 102-785.
03/05/1992SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/05/1992 Referred to
03/20/1992 Hearings by
06/24/1992 Markup by
07/20/1992 Reported by S.Rept 102-322

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2322. View summaries

Shown Here:
Senate agreed to House amendment with amendment (09/22/1992)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1992 - Increases the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents of certain disabled veterans, the clothing allowance for certain service-disabled veterans, dependency and indemnity compensation, and supplemental dependency and indemnity compensation for children. Increases each such rate by the same percentage as the increase in benefit amounts under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act.

Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to adjust administratively the rates of disability compensation payable to persons who are not in receipt of compensation for service-connected disability or death.

Requires the Secretary to publish such increases in the Federal Register at the same time that percentage increases under title II of the Social Security Act are required to be published.