Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/24/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 03/26/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/02/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/09/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/09/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/29/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 04/29/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/05/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 05/05/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/05/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 05/05/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/19/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/19/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/19/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/19/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/02/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/02/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/04/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/04/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/10/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/10/1992
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/11/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/11/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/18/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/24/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/30/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/30/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/30/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/01/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/20/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/20/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/22/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/29/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/29/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/29/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 08/03/1992
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 08/05/1992
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 08/12/1992