Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/24/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/31/1992
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/05/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/05/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 05/05/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/14/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/14/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/19/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/21/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/21/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/02/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/24/1992
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 07/21/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/23/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/23/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/24/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/24/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/15/1992