There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to approve the President's rescission proposals submitted to the Congress on March 20, 1992.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/25/1992Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
03/25/1992Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill.
Action By: Senate
03/25/1992Read twice and referred to the Committee on Budget pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/31/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/31/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Appropriations03/25/1992 Referred to
Senate Budget03/25/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2453.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2453. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/25/1992)

Rescinds the budgetary resources specified in the rescission proposal (R92-75) (North Miami Center for Contemporary Art, Florida) transmitted to the Congress by the President on March 20, 1992, pursuant to the Congressional Budget and Impoundment Control Act of 1974.