Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 01/23/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/29/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/29/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 01/29/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 01/29/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 01/29/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 01/29/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/29/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 01/29/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 01/29/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/29/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/05/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/05/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 02/05/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/07/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/26/1991
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/05/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/07/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/12/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/13/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/14/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/11/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/17/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/23/1991
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/24/1991
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/24/1991
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/24/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/24/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/24/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/24/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/24/1991
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/10/1991
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 07/17/1991
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 08/01/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 04/09/1992