There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Persian Gulf War Criminals Prosecution Act of 1991

Short Titles as Introduced

Geneva Conventions Enforcement Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the establishment of appropriate legal forums for the enforcement of the Geneva Conventions.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/18/1991Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
04/18/1991Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
01/23/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/23/1992HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/17/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/17/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/06/1991HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
06/06/1991HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Judiciary.
04/22/1991SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/22/1991-12:05pmHouseHeld at the desk.
04/22/1991-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/18/1991SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
04/18/1991SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
04/18/1991SenateS.Amdt.73 Amendment SP 73 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
04/18/1991SenateS.Amdt.73 Proposed by Senator Gore for Senator Pell. To support and facilitate the carrying out of such duties and responsibilities as may be required of the U.S. role with respect to the prosecution of Persian Gulf war criminals before such international criminal tribunal once it is established.
04/18/1991SenateS.Amdt.72 Amendment SP 72 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
04/18/1991SenateS.Amdt.72 Proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator McCain. A bill to add a reference to the Geneva Convention relating to the use of environmental modification techniques.
04/18/1991SenateMeasure laid before Senate.
04/18/1991SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/18/1991SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 62.
04/18/1991SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
04/09/1991SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
01/23/1991SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 01/23/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 04/18/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/18/1991

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/23/1991 Referred to
04/09/1991 Hearings by
04/18/1991 Markup by
04/18/1991 Reported by
House Judiciary06/06/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees04/23/1992 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs06/06/1991 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East06/17/1991 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations06/17/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.253.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.253. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (04/18/1991)

Persian Gulf War Criminals Prosecution Act of 1991 - Title I: Actions by United States Agencies and Courts - Requires the President to direct Government agencies to collect and maintain evidence of crimes committed by Persian Gulf war criminals. Directs the President to consult with the Attorney General, the Secretary of State, and the Secretary of Defense to determine the appropriate jurisdiction for the prosecution of such criminals.

Title II: International Criminal Tribunal - Urges the President, acting through the U.S. Permanent Representative to the United Nations, to propose to the Security Council the establishment of an international criminal tribunal for the prosecution of Persian Gulf war criminals. Urges the President to work with the coalition of nations participating in Operation Desert Storm to establish such tribunal if the Security Council fails to take action to do so.

Establishes the Office for the Prosecution of Persian Gulf War Criminals within the Department of State.

Title III: Congressional Oversight - Requires the President to report to the Senate Foreign Relations Committee and the House Foreign Affairs Committee on: (1) the proposal developed by the Office for the establishment of an international criminal tribunal; (2) evidence of crimes under international law that justifies the prosecution of Persian Gulf war criminals; and (3) Iraqi authorities who should be prosecuted for committing such crimes.